U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00295-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ASHCRAFT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 20, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.