U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10011-
  • Case Name: Fitzgerald, III v. Mekonnen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 19, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Returned Mail]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 26, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Held (AP)]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • September 08, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons - Service Executed]
  • September 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.