U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00161
  • Case Name: Michael Hernandez-Mendez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule J]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule I]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule E/F]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule D]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule C]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Converting Case From Ch 13 To Ch 7]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File A Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7]
January, 2023
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order For Debtor's Employer To Pay Trustee]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Proposed Order]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • September 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Avoid Lien]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Determine Value of Property/Security]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Avoid Lien]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Determine Value of Property/Security]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.