U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00281-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VAUGHN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 09, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 09, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.