U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 17, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 17, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 09, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 13, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.