U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEST
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Criminal History Report]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Bond ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 19, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.