U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRIVOTT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 19, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.