U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00164-
  • Case Name: Amy K Mejia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Secured Claim]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Request to Withdraw Document]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • December 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Support Document]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Avoid Lien]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Opposition]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Secured Claim]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • September 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.