U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00299-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHILCOAT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Leave to File Denied]
  • October 07, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2024: [Modify]
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Leave to File Denied]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 28, 2022: [Affidavit ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Leave to File Denied]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.