U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WINEGEART
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue ]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.