U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00300-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SISCA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 13, 2022: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.