U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STEVENS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
  • January 25, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 24, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Revoke]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.