U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AMBROSE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.