U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KIT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.