U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MANWARING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.