U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GALARZA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • September 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.