U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00166
  • Case Name: A Better Way of Life, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Close Case - Ch 11 (Dismissed)]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order To Show Cause]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order - Generic]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case to 7]
  • October 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
September, 2022
  • September 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • September 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Notice]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.