U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-10013-
  • Case Name: Cunningham v. Santander Consumer USA et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Disposition of Adversary]
  • December 03, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Dismiss Case]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
October, 2022
  • October 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay]
  • September 16, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.