U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00168-
  • Case Name: Tamika Donneisha Carper
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Request for Hearing Date]
October, 2022
  • October 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Dismiss Case]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.