U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00311-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GOULD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.