U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00312-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 15, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 03, 2022: [Information - Felony]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.