U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00309-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BYRD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time to]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Suppress]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 27, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.