U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KNOWLES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 07, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 06, 2022: [Errata]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • September 19, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.