U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00170
  • Case Name: Rontinique Jackson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedule C]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.