U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00203-2
  • Case Name: USA v. BRODY et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Travel ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • September 27, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.