U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JORDAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.