U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00313-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAUGH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • January 20, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Routine Processing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.