U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 16, 2025: [Supplemental Record Sent USCA]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Supplement to any document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 03, 2022: [Compel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 31, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • October 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 21, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.