U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00317-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOPKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [.Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Amended Information]
  • October 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.