U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00282-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOSTOCK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.