U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00314-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEYDEN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.