U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00086
  • Case Name: VIDEOLABS, INC. v. ACER INC. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Letters Rogatory Issued]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 09, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [.Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.