U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00319-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WARGO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.