U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00207-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ESTEY et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Stipulation]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 23, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.