U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00171
  • Case Name: Adamio Charles Boddie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 08, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.