U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00173-
  • Case Name: Maurice A. Murrow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Support Document]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [eNoticing Request Form]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order - Generic]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • October 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order To Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.