U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SNOWDEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 27, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • September 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.