U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00320-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAMOTTA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.