U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00174
  • Case Name: Alena Francescia Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Albert, Marc E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.