U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00202-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Warrant ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Warrant ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 04, 2022: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 28, 2022: [Placement in High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.