U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00176-
  • Case Name: Lysle S Follette, III
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.