U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00089
  • Case Name: CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY AND LABORERS JOINT PENSION TRUST et al v. UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 04, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 01, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 18, 2022: [Intervene]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • September 29, 2022: [Motion to Compel (Initiating)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.