U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00326-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRADLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 08, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 08, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.