U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00327-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SNOWDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 21, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Indictment]
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.