U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00325-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VASSALLO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Protective Order ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.