U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00323-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ABOD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.