U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00310-4
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [.Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Criminal History Report]
  • January 23, 2023: [Criminal History Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 11, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 08, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Bond ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 06, 2022: [Bond ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 29, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 08, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 26, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.