U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00217-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUNFEE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2023: [Exclude]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.