U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.