U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00331-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 11, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.